Financial history THE CHAPELS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1014207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.73k £7.04k £5.78k £7.27k £4.79k
Total expenditure £6.00k £6.71k £5.23k £6.29k £3.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A