Accounts and annual returns ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE
Charity number: 1014455
Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 145 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 145 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 May 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 207 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window