Accounts and annual returns MALUJU - SOUTH AFRICAN ARTISTS FOR PEACE
Charity number: 1014647
Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 698 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 698 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1063 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1063 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1428 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1428 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 09 June 2019 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window