Financial history ACT(UK)

Charity number: 1014755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.14k £7.04k £4.76k £2.02k £1.64k
Total expenditure £8.85k £7.25k £6.98k £2.88k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A