Accounts and annual returns 1ST HOLSWORTHY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1014782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 September 2021 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 September 2021 235 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required