Financial history 1ST HOLSWORTHY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1014782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £15.59k £24.82k £29.47k £28.73k £17.80k
Total expenditure £14.53k £15.94k £16.19k £37.99k £17.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A