ST VINCENT'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1014889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.25m £3.44m £3.46m £3.59m £3.87m
Total expenditure £3.16m £3.09m £3.31m £3.48m £3.77m
Income from government contracts £565.52k £691.08k N/A £430.00k £500.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £475.00k N/A £7.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.76k £141.47k £25.56k £3.09k £8.84k
Income - Other trading activities £90.39k £84.22k £0 £8.22k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.14m £3.21m £3.30m £3.45m £3.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.62k £0 £128.04k £127.33k £123.23k
Income - Other £1.51k £7.39k £5.26k £0 £13.07k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.15m £3.09m £3.30m £3.47m £3.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £709 £6.67k £9.87k £12.10k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £709 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.94k £0 £0 £0 £0