28TH DONCASTER ST EDMUNDS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1015123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.92k £16.31k £19.22k £17.72k £16.49k
Total expenditure £14.55k £14.70k £17.34k £16.99k £13.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k