Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF HAYES PARK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH NOVEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED ON 4TH OCTOBER 1979, 22ND JULY 1982 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 1995 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING HAYES PARK SCHOOLS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE - (A) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOLS (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOLS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT (C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Maes buddion
HAYES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.