THE ANGLICAN-LUTHERAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1015153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.41k £10.17k £28.37k £9.19k £9.01k
Total expenditure £26.96k £4.76k £29.77k £10.72k £3.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A