BERKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1015269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL GRAHAM BEVAN Trustee 07 July 2014 None on record
Andrew Williamson Trustee 04 July 2019
RAINY DAY TRUST Received: On time
RAINY DAY TRUST Received: On time
Natalie Arafua Greenstreet Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
David Owen Wooldridge Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
Marc Brunel-Walker Trustee 23 September 2020
1ST CROWTHORNE SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
ERICA DIANE HUNTER Trustee 07 July 2015
MAIDENHEAD & DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Moya Sanford Taylor Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Stuart Ford Trustee 06 March 2018 None on record
MR PETE JEFFREYS Trustee None on record
PETER SMITH Trustee 06 July 2016 None on record
IAN MAY Trustee 08 January 2013 None on record
IAN AITKEN Chair 06 July 2017 None on record
ROBIN MICHAEL KENT Trustee 07 July 2015
89TH READING (MILESTONE WOOD) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time