Financial history THE NATIONAL HOCKEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1015550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £76.79k £71.08k £84.86k £27.45k £445
Total expenditure £310.73k £517.08k £215.74k £463.69k £309.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A