Financial history AGAPE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1015693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £162.81k £183.44k £201.41k £190.91k £203.66k
Total expenditure £163.59k £181.93k £196.18k £215.92k £191.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £43.16k