Trustees EVERSLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1015742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sultan Hassan | Chair | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Smith | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachna Shah | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maya Shah | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katy Spitaliotis | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Haltan Hassan | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ozlem Mehmet | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Pratik Shah | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sayuri Christina Kamiya | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sotiroulla Miltiadous | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Ioannou | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.