RAYMOND WILLIAMS MEMORIAL TRUST SOCIETY

Charity number: 1015887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 17 January 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 21 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required