1ST KENDAL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1015973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.00k £28.25k £29.32k £16.52k £39.35k
Total expenditure £17.62k £10.46k £55.54k £20.84k £8.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.67k