THE NORTH LONDON YOUTH SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1015997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.39k £6.86k £8.00k £8.03k £12.31k
Total expenditure £25.15k £5.10k £5.61k £5.71k £5.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A