Accounts and annual returns LILLESHALL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1016003
Charity reporting is overdue by 645 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 645 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 645 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 April 2021 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 24 January 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window