KASHMIR WELFARE ASSOCIATION (NEWHAM)

Charity number: 1016333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 February 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1688 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1688 days