PHOENIX GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 1016375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £306.57k £332.52k £424.82k £408.37k £428.56k
Total expenditure £311.85k £336.94k £383.52k £421.39k £392.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £39.49k