Dogfen lywodraethu GLADSTONE THEATRE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED ON 06 SEP 2001 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2018 as amended on 01 Aug 2019 as amended on 01 Aug 2019 as amended on 11 Nov 2018 as amended on 29 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objectives of GTT shall be to educate the public in the dramatic, cinema graphic, operatic and musical arts and to further the developments of public appreciation and taste in the said arts (to assist and further such charitable institutions and charitable purposes as the Committee shall from time to time determine) and in furtherance of this objective, but not otherwise, the GTT, through its Management Committee, shall have the following powers:- a) To promote plays, dramas, comedies, opera and other dramatic, operatic and musical works of educational value. both Amateur and Professional. b) To purchase, acquire and obtain interest in the copyright of or right to perform or show any such dramatic or operatic works, which would come under the jurisdiction of the Theatre Manager and Truteess. c) To provide and maintain premises for such presentations. d) To purchase or acquire technical equipment, plant machinery, furniture, fixtures, scenery and all other necessary effects. e) To raise funds and to invite and receive contributions from any company or companies, person or persons whatsoever by way of subscriptions, donations and otherwise: providing that the GTT shall not undertake any permanent trading activities in raising funds. f) To provide facilities for Educational Courses in various aspects in the Arts which the GTT deem acceptable. g) To do all such things as shall further the objects of the GTT, both monetary and for the well being of all members of the Gladstone Theatre.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.