Trustees FOUNDATION FOR CREDIT COUNSELLING

Charity number: 1016630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN GUTHRIE GRIFFITH-JONES Chair 07 January 2019
J C BAKER TRUST
Received: On time
Janet Pope Trustee 01 January 2024
CAMDEN SCHOOL FOUNDATION OF FRANCES MARY BUSS
Received: On time
THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Michael St John Ashley Trustee 01 July 2023
THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Elizabeth Mary Harding Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Susan Acton Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Yvonne Jean MacDermid Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Christopher Mark Wood Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Nicholas Michael Caplan Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
Lesley Jane Titcomb Trustee 21 January 2019
None on record
Barbara Helen Dean Trustee 21 January 2019
None on record
Tim Frost Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
Chris Stern Trustee 01 July 2016
NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL CROFTON, ORPINGTON
Received: On time