Financial history GREAT OXENDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1016964
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/05/2017 02/05/2018 02/05/2019 02/05/2020 02/05/2021
Total gross income £6.69k £8.51k £7.07k £7.41k £11.69k
Total expenditure £8.49k £6.79k £6.03k £5.28k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k