Financial history FRIENDS OF JOHN BALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1017014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £61.24k £39.12k £48.46k £54.75k £27.14k
Total expenditure £75.61k £23.09k £55.39k £24.94k £28.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A