BISHOPSTONE WITH HINTON PARVA WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1017054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.22k £3.22k £2.82k £1.64k £1.64k
Total expenditure £3.07k £3.07k £2.96k £1.16k £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A