Trustees TIPTON ST JOHN PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1017119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Ronald Davies | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisette Fern Johnston | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BOYLE | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hunt | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LAUREN BRYONY TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BIRCH | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANN TAYLOR | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN FRANCES MYLNE | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RAYMOND BELTON | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.