Trustees ALLEYN COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 1017369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Oddie | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
GRAHAM REEDER | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Emily Fraser | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mark James Albon | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
George William Denys Wilcox | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH NICOLE DRUMMOND | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD MARK GREEN | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
JOHN WARREN THEODORE WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.