Accounts and annual returns AVAIL

Charity number: 1017386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window