CREWE MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1017441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 29 March 2021 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 29 March 2021 485 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 January 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 January 2016 17 January 2017 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 January 2016 Not Required