CREWE MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1017441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/01/2016 28/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £12.14k £5.00k £4.44k £6.79k £6.16k
Total expenditure £9.15k £6.30k £4.01k £5.66k £4.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £401 N/A N/A N/A N/A