SOCIETY OF PETROLEUM ENGINEERS EUROPE LIMITED

Charity number: 1017482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.14m £4.16m £2.79m £4.48m £1.83m
Total expenditure £5.47m £4.06m £4.17m £3.41m £2.13m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.64m £83.71k £2.51m £56.60k
Income - Charitable activities £2.98m £1.36m £2.52m £1.84m £685.05k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £150.89k £158.97k £178.81k £127.28k £0
Income - Other £8.77k £0 £0 £0 £1.09m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.28m £3.94m £4.07m £3.32m £2.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £27.67k £106.76k £94.11k £122.12k
Expenditure - Governance £198.99k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £27.67k £0 £21.44k £6.38k
Expenditure - Other £195.46k £88.76k £0 £0 £0