BRITISH ROUGE DE L'OUEST SHEEP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1017603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required