BRITISH ROUGE DE L'OUEST SHEEP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1017603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.32k £10.91k £6.65k £7.91k £10.75k
Total expenditure £11.80k £11.76k £9.79k £7.98k £6.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A