Financial history ST SAVIOUR'S HALL

Charity number: 1017813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.52k £13.64k £13.70k £13.77k £13.74k
Total expenditure £2.02k £2.13k £2.20k £2.27k £2.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A