PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION BLACKBURN

Charity number: 1017867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.80k £6.50k £6.50k £6.50k £5.20k
Total expenditure £8.53k £5.00k £5.94k £3.16k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A