Accounts and annual returns 1ST CRANBROOK SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1018838
Charity reporting is overdue by 1707 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 246 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 246 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 611 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 611 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 976 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 976 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1342 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1342 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1707 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1707 days