Financial history 1ST CRANBROOK SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1018838
Charity reporting is overdue by 1707 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £9.28k £6.01k £6.61k £4.39k £6.91k
Total expenditure £10.01k £7.90k £7.37k £5.70k £5.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A