Financial history WEST COKER CHURCH HALL

Charity number: 1019504
Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £60 £69 £401 £228 £80.75k
Total expenditure £0 £5.80k £0 £0 £114.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £870