Dogfen lywodraethu WESSEX COMMUNITY ACTION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 1993, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 JULY 1998, 14 DECEMBER 2004 AND 12 DECEMBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 FEB 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF WILTSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. 2. TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE. 3. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS: (A) "THIRD SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES. (B) "CHARITIES" ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (C) "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Maes buddion
THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF WILTSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.