COWES TOWN WATERFRONT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1019760
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 26 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 26 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 15 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 15 April 2016 On time Download