Trustees THE HOLLAND-ON-SEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1019949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kim Masters Trustee 30 August 2018
None on record
ANN BATEMAN Trustee 22 May 2015
None on record
Carol Chowne Trustee 29 May 2014
None on record
Joyce Woodward Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record
Glennis Ruddell Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record
MARGARET SMITH Trustee 25 January 2012
None on record
BARBARA EWENS Trustee
None on record
IRIS KONIOTES Trustee
None on record
BERYL READ Trustee
None on record