TONBRIDGE GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1020254
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £37.13k £28.44k £23.13k £28.71k £16.65k
Total expenditure £19.69k £32.91k £27.52k £24.36k £13.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A