HYDE HEATH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1020591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £69.67k £52.34k £75.55k £75.69k £101.84k
Total expenditure £86.00k £69.45k £68.67k £74.68k £74.30k
Income from government contracts £52.35k £31.62k £61.42k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £52.25k £60.81k