HYDE HEATH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1020591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen O'Neill Trustee 27 May 2017 None on record
Sujeewa Gadd Trustee 02 May 2019 None on record
Carrie Swallow Chair 14 June 2018 None on record
Kirsty Beale Trustee 09 April 2018 None on record
Alan Hennessy Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record