MAESTEG ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1020630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 October 2020 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 October 2020 159 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 November 2016 On time Download