RESERVE FORCES AND CADETS ASSOCIATION FOR GREATER LONDON CHARITABLE FUND FOR THE AIR TRAINING CORPS

Charity number: 1020785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8 £9 £104 £9 £10
Total expenditure £2.79k £3.02k £0 £0 £2
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A