Accounts and annual returns SUTTON AND ERDINGTON MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1020820
Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 10 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window