Accounts and annual returns HODDESDON WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1020891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 May 2020 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required