THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN AND ST ELIZABETH

Charity number: 1020916
Charity reporting is up to date
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0