Accounts and annual returns MAGIC ROUNDABOUT

Charity number: 1021135
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 February 2010 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 June 2009 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted